EP4165245 - ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUSA, Dominik 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
CAMPOS SOUZA, José Luiz 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Thomas 89129 Langenau / DE | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Voith Patent GmbH - Patentabteilung St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21729439.6 | 25.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021EP63815 | Priority number, date | DE202010115802 | 16.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020115802 | [2023/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254732 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165245 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/40, B65H23/025, D21F7/00, D21G1/02 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
D21F1/40 (EP);
B65H23/0255 (EP);
B65H23/24 (EP);
D21F7/005 (EP);
D21G1/0233 (EP);
B65H2406/112 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | WALZE | [2023/16] | English: | ROLLER | [2023/16] | French: | ROULEAU | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 16.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4566162 (BRANDS GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 33; figure - * [A] 6,7,11-15; | [XA]EP0663363 (KOREN ERWIN [AT]) [X] 1,3,4,9-13 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 21; figure - * [A] 2,5-8,14,15; | [XA]DE19857123 (LUERAFLEX GMBH G LUECKENOTTO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 11; figure - *[A] 5,6,11-15 | by applicant | DE1003564 |