EP4168370 - HYDRATION CONTROL MIXTURE FOR MORTAR AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASSL, Harald 83308 Trostberg / DE | 02 /
DENGLER, Joachim 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
BIZZOZERO, Julien 83308 Trostberg / DE | 04 /
SCHOEBEL, Alexander 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21729583.1 | 07.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021EP65102 | Priority number, date | EP20200180655 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20180655 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254802 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168370 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4168370 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B24/04, C04B28/06, C04B103/20 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
C04B24/04 (EP,US);
C04B24/06 (US);
C04B28/04 (EP,US);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/065 (EP,US);
C04B28/08 (EP);
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B28/16 (EP,US);
C04B2103/20 (EP);
C04B2111/00155 (EP);
C04B2111/00508 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00517 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00637 (EP);
C04B2111/00672 (EP,US);
C04B2111/27 (EP,US);
C04B2111/60 (EP);
C04B2111/62 (EP,US);
C04B2111/70 (EP,US);
C04B2111/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B7/32, C04B7/323, C04B22/10, C04B24/003, C04B24/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/163, C04B24/243, C04B24/2647, C04B38/10, C04B40/0608 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B22/10, C04B24/04 (EP);
C04B28/08, C04B22/10, C04B24/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRIERUNGSSTEUERUNGSMISCHUNG FÜR MÖRTEL- UND ZEMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/17] | English: | HYDRATION CONTROL MIXTURE FOR MORTAR AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS | [2023/17] | French: | MÉLANGE RÉGULATEUR D'HYDRATATION POUR COMPOSITIONS DE MORTIER ET DE CIMENT | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/17] | MÉLANGE DE CONTRÔLE D'HYDRATATION POUR MORTIER ET COMPOSITIONS DE CIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 18.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5556458 (BROOK JOHN W [US], et al); | [AD]WO2017212044 (BASF SE [DE]) | by applicant | US4430469 | DE4411797 | CH686186 | CA2172004 | EP0753488 | EP0894811 | US6555683 | WO2006042709 | EP1851256 | WO2008012438 | WO2009103579 | WO2010026155 | WO2010040612 | EP2463314 | WO2014114784 | WO2014114782 | WO2017212044 | EP20140198721 |