EP4164586 - AN ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION FOR TACKLING MALODOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASGUPTA, Anindya Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 02 /
SAJI, Maya, Treesa Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 03 /
SALGAONKAR, Neha Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | James, Helen Sarah Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21730086.2 | 03.06.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021EP64942 | Priority number, date | IN202021025117 | 15.06.2020 Original published format: IN202021025117 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254790 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164586 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61P17/10, A61Q15/00, A61Q19/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
A61Q19/008 (EP);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/005 (US);
A61K2800/5922 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM TACKING VON SCHLECHTEM GERUCH | [2023/16] | English: | AN ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION FOR TACKLING MALODOUR | [2023/16] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTIMICROBIENNE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES MAUVAISES ODEURS | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB744547 (HARRY HURST) [X] 1-13 * page 3, lines 45-52; claim 1 *; | [X]CH497846 (PECHINEY PROGIL SA [FR]) [X] 1-13* page 5, lines 24-27 *; | [X]US4925655 (SMIGEL IRWIN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 2, lines 20-38, 49 *; | [X]DE102017212646 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * example 16 * | by applicant | WO9517159 |