EP4162325 - SUBSTRATE CLEANING SOLUTION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CLEANED SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINUTA, Takafumi Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka, 437-1412 / JP | 02 /
NAGAHARA, Tatsuro Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka, 437-1412 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21730819.6 | 31.05.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021EP64507 | Priority number, date | JP20200096652 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020096652 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245014 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162325 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/40, H01L21/02 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
G03F7/40 (EP);
G03F7/425 (KR);
C11D7/5004 (KR,US);
C11D17/0013 (US);
C11D7/265 (KR,US);
C11D7/34 (KR);
C11D7/36 (KR);
H01L21/02057 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/308 (KR);
C11D2111/22 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | SUBSTRATREINIGUNGSLÖSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEREINIGTEN SUBSTRATS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2023/15] | English: | SUBSTRATE CLEANING SOLUTION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CLEANED SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2023/15] | French: | SOLUTION DE NETTOYAGE DE SUBSTRAT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT NETTOYÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 01.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2019212890 (SCREEN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-14 * comparative examples 4-7; paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0015] - [0048] - [0159] - [0202]; examples 32,33; claims 1-30; tables 3,4 *[I] 15 | by applicant | JP2018110220 | JP2019212889 | JP2019212890 |