EP4162193 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR URBAN OR EXTRA-URBAN JOURNEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Overade 96, Rue Orfila 75020 Paris / FR | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARROUART, Philippe 75020 Paris / FR | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21730915.2 | 04.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021EP65048 | Priority number, date | FR20200005860 | 04.06.2020 Original published format: FR 2005860 | [2023/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245257 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162193 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21L4/02, A42B3/04, F21V21/084 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
F21L4/027 (EP);
A42B3/044 (EP);
F21V21/084 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STÄDTISCHE ODER AUSSERSTÄDTISCHE REISE | [2023/15] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE FOR URBAN OR EXTRA-URBAN JOURNEYS | [2023/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE POUR DEPLACEMENTS URBAINS OU EXTRA-URBAINS | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2424820 (LONGSTAFF JOHN SOTHERON [GB]) [A] 1-17* figures 1-6 *; | [I]WO2009101391 (COMBAT LIGHTING LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-17 * figures 1,2 *; | [I]WO2010030356 (EVEREADY BATTERY INC [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 30; figures 3B,3D,4A,7 *; | [A]CN108741371 (ZHANG DAN) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-4 * |