EP4158302 - RECOGNITION OF TOOTH CONTACT WITH A LUMINESCENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gleason Works 1000 University Avenue Rochester, NY 14607 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADTFELD, Hermann, J. 54531 Manderscheid / DE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21731348.5 | 17.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US32689 | Priority number, date | US202063031919P | 29.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063031919 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021242549 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158302 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01M13/021 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G01M13/021 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (US);
G01N2021/6497 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG DES ZAHNKONTAKTS MIT EINEM LUMINESZENZMITTEL | [2023/14] | English: | RECOGNITION OF TOOTH CONTACT WITH A LUMINESCENT AGENT | [2023/14] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE DE CONTACT DE DENT À L'AIDE D'UN AGENT LUMINESCENT | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 19.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4618256 (BARTOLOMEO MARK E [US]) [A] 10* column 2, line 54 - line 61 *; | [XI]US2014239194 (GIANGRANDE HOLLY A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-16 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 7-10; | [XI]DE102017105477 (UNIV BREMEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12,13,16 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,6,10,11,14,15 | by applicant | US5610994 | US5662439 | US6120355 |