EP4171878 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GREEN BODY AND METHOD FOR FURTHER PROCESSING THE GREEN BODY TO FORM A MACHINING SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Thorsten 9436 Balgach / CH | 02 /
HOOP, Matthaeus 9492 Eschen / LI | 03 /
BRITT, Thomas 8890 Flums / CH | 04 /
STRACKE, Jens 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 05 /
MOSELEY, Steven 6820 Nenzing-Gurtis / AT | 06 /
SZABÓ, József 6000 KECSKEMÉT / HU | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21732008.4 | 10.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021EP65614 | Priority number, date | EP20200181949 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20181949 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259652 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171878 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B24D5/06, B24D7/06, B24D18/00, B22F3/02, B22F3/10, B22F3/14, B22F7/06, B22F7/08, B22F5/00, B24D5/12, B24D99/00, B28D1/04, B28D1/12 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B22F3/02 (EP,US);
B24D5/063 (EP,US);
B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/14 (EP,US);
B22F7/062 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
B24D18/0009 (EP,US);
B24D7/063 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
B22F2005/005 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B24D2203/00 (EP);
B24D5/12 (EP);
B24D99/005 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F7/08, B22F7/062, B22F3/02, B22F3/10, B22F3/14 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F2005/001, B22F2005/005 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GRÜNLINGS UND VERFAHREN ZUR WEITERVERARBEITUNG DES GRÜNLINGS IN EIN BEARBEITUNGSSEGMENT | [2023/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GREEN BODY AND METHOD FOR FURTHER PROCESSING THE GREEN BODY TO FORM A MACHINING SEGMENT | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS CRU ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ULTÉRIEUR DU CORPS CRU POUR FORMER UN SEGMENT D'USINAGE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 24.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2143636 (TONE FRANK J) [A] 1-7 * claims 1, 2, 9 ** figures 3, 4 *; | [X]US5203880 (TSELESIN NAUM N [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 48 * * column 6, lines 11-34 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP0754106 (ULTIMATE ABRASIVE SYST INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0040]; figure 10A * * paragraphs [0069] , [0 70]; figure 20A * | by applicant | EP2745965 | EP2745966 | EP3670041 |