EP4154237 - BREATH GUIDE DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breathpen Limited 19 Wimpole Street London W1G 8GE / GB | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHER, Ben London W1G 8GE / GB | 02 /
MCKEMEY, Alex London W1G 8GE / GB | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ben Ben Williams IP Limited St. John's House St. John's Street Chichester, West Sussex PO19 1UU / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21732196.7 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63729 | Priority number, date | GB20200007715 | 22.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202007715 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021234177 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154237 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G09B19/003 (EP);
A61B5/087 (GB,US);
A61B5/097 (EP,GB);
A61B5/486 (GB);
A61M16/06 (EP);
A61M16/202 (EP);
A63B23/18 (GB,US);
A61M16/00 (EP);
A61M16/0493 (EP);
A61M2205/3313 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/582 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2210/0618 (EP);
A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | ATEMFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | BREATH GUIDE DEVICE AND METHOD | [2023/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE DE RESPIRATION | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2011124470 (SPURLING DAVID ALASTAIR [GB], et al) [I] 1,2,4-25 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0026] , [0027] , [0031] , [0033] , [0036] - paragraph [0050]; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2016120441 (ZHU XIAORAN [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0031] *; | [I]WO2018011358 (AEROFIT DK APS [DK]) [I] 1,18 * pages 2,5,9 *; | [A]US2018339122 (LUNZ MANUELA [NL], et al) [A] 4,6-12,19-23 * paragraphs [0100] , [0199] *; | [I]EP3424549 (COREFOX OY [FI]) [I] 1,18* paragraphs [0006] , [0015] , [0016] *; | [I]EP3653252 (HAPELLA OY [FI]) [I] 1,18 * paragraphs [0043] , [0089] , [0091]; figure 2 * |