EP4128521 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A RECTIFIER CONNECTED TO A PERMANENT-MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC GENERATOR TO PROVIDE A DIRECT VOLTAGE, CORRESPONDING DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Safran Electrical & Power Parc d'Activité Andromède 1 Rue Louis Blériot CS 80049 31702 Blagnac / FR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABER, Christelle SAFRAN c/o CENTRE d'EXCELLENCE PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE Rond-Point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
ROUGIER, Florent SAFRAN c/o CENTRE d'EXCELLENCE PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE Rond-Point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
FLORESCU, Adrian SAFRAN c/o CENTRE d'EXCELLENCE PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE Rond-Point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
NADHERIA, Mallika SAFRAN c/o CENTRE d'EXCELLENCE PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE Rond-Point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21732375.7 | 25.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021FR50518 | Priority number, date | FR20200003370 | 03.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003370 | [2023/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021198594 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4128521 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00, H02P11/04 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H02P21/00 (EP);
H02P11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GLEICHRICHTERS, DER AN EINEN PERMANENT-MAGNET-SYNCHRONGENERATOR ANGESCHLOSSEN IST, UM EINE GLEICHSPANNUNG BEREITZUSTELLEN, ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A RECTIFIER CONNECTED TO A PERMANENT-MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC GENERATOR TO PROVIDE A DIRECT VOLTAGE, CORRESPONDING DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN REDRESSEUR CONNECTÉ À UNE GÉNÉRATRICE ÉLECTRIQUE SYNCHRONE À AIMANTS PERMANENTS POUR FOURNIR UNE TENSION CONTINUE, PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 24.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013106368 (YAMASHITA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2013335041 (BAEK JEI-HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]WO2014173954 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-8 * page 24, line 8 - page 28, line 9; figures 3A,4A * | by applicant | US2013106368 | US2013335041 | WO2014173954 |