EP4143421 - INTERMEDIATE FLOW-STRAIGHTENING CASING WITH MONOBLOC STRUCTURAL ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOUPIL, Frédéric Jacques Eugène 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
MARLIN, François Marie Paul 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
ORIEUX, Kaëlig Merwen 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
VERSEUX, Philippe 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 05 /
CHERAGA, Yacine 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21732391.4 | 22.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021FR50695 | Priority number, date | FR20200004258 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2004258 | [2023/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219949 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143421 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/16, F01D11/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
F01D25/162 (EP);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D25/28 (US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F01D11/001 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT ZWISCHENFLUSSGLÄTTUNG MIT MONOBLOCKSTRUKTURARM | [2023/10] | English: | INTERMEDIATE FLOW-STRAIGHTENING CASING WITH MONOBLOC STRUCTURAL ARM | [2023/10] | French: | CARTER INTERMEDIAIRE DE REDRESSEMENT AVEC BRAS STRUCTURAL MONOBLOC | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 04.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]SE528183 (VOLVO AERO CORP [SE]) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 21] - [0025] - [0 29]; figures 3, 4 * [A] 4,6,7,9,12-14; | [Y]EP3450685 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 2,3* paragraph [0033]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US10458247 (CHARBONNIER SIMON PIERRE CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10,11,15 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 3; figures 4, 5 * | by applicant | SE528183 | EP3450685 | US10458247 |