EP4165340 - INDUCTIVE LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | 18.08.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schreder S.A. Rue de Lusambo 67 1190 Bruxelles / BE | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE ANGELIS, Jimmy 4000 LIÈGE / BE | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21733959.7 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021EP66296 | Priority number, date | NL20202025841 | 16.06.2020 Original published format: NL 2025841 | NL20202025842 | 16.06.2020 Original published format: NL 2025842 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021255120 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165340 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21V21/34, H05B45/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y115/15 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
F21S2/00 (EP);
F21V21/34 (EP);
H05B45/30 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/15 (EP);
H05B45/392 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVES BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/16] | English: | INDUCTIVE LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2023/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE INDUCTIF | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB652374 (HARRY COTTON) [X] 1,3-5,9,15-17,20,21,24,26 * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 95 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,10-12,14,18,19,22-25,27; | [XI]WO9716054 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,4-9,14,17,18,20,21,24,27 * page 7, line 20 - page 18, line 9 * * figures 1-8 *[I] 2,16,19,22,23,25; | [XI]WO03040612 (HEFTER CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1,4,9,15,18,20,21,24-26,28 * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 16 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 2,3,5-8,14,16,19,22,23,27; | [XI]US2007236159 (BELAND ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1,3-12,14,18,20,24,27 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 4,4a,4b,4c * [I] 2,16,19,21-23,25; | [XI]WO2018087573 (GREENGAGE LIGHTING LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9,14,16,17,20,21,24,27 * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 6 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 15,19,22,23,25 |