EP4347069 - HYBRID CLOUD AND LOCAL RENDERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETRICH, JR., Sim Douglas Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 21734259.1 | 26.05.2021 | [2024/15] | WO2021US34176 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022250662 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347069 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/355, A63F13/67 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A63F13/355 (EP);
A63F13/35 (US);
A63F13/67 (EP);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/40 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
A63F2300/8082 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE CLOUD UND LOKALE DARSTELLUNG | [2024/15] | English: | HYBRID CLOUD AND LOCAL RENDERING | [2024/15] | French: | NUAGE HYBRIDE ET RENDU LOCAL | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 23.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012107739 (MUSTAFA AWAIS I [GB], et al); | [XYI]WO2018047168 (XTRMX LTD [IL]); | [Y]US10092834 (GEORGIEV STEPHAN [CA], et al) |