EP4157165 - AN OSTOMY POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConvaTec Limited GDC First Avenue Deeside, Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Kevin Deeside, Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21734458.9 | 01.06.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021GB51339 | Priority number, date | GB20200008261 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202008261 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245396 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157165 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4157165 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61F5/441, A61F5/445 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61F5/443 (EP,US);
A61F5/441 (EP,US);
A61F5/4404 (EP);
A61F5/445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OSTOMIEBEUTEL | [2023/14] | English: | AN OSTOMY POUCH | [2023/14] | French: | POCHE DE STOMIE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2024
10.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE Salts Healthcare Limited Richard Street Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB Opponent's representative Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/25] | 23.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4411659 (JENSEN MARVIN E [US], et al); | [XI]US7559922 (BOTTEN RONALD S [US]); | [XI]WO2013142577 (HOLLISTER INC [US]); | [Y]DE102014104737 (FOR LIFE PRODUKTIONS UND VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT FÜR HEIL UND HILFSMITTEL MBH [DE]); | [Y]CN208989319U (ZHENDE MEDICAL CO LTD) | Opposition | US2003014023 | WO2013142577 | GB2512655 | GB2566721 | GB2569212 |