EP3990769 - THRUST REVERSER FOR TURBOFAN PROPULSION SYSTEM OF AN AIRCRAFT AND THRUST REVERSAL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonardo S.p.A. Piazza Monte Grappa 4 00195 Roma / IT | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLI, Massimo 21057 Olgiate Olona (Varese) / IT | 02 /
VERCELLESI, Marco 20131 Milano / IT | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Verdecchia, Valerio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21734504.0 | 09.06.2021 | [2022/18] | WO2021IB55056 | Priority number, date | IT20200013846 | 10.06.2020 Original published format: IT202000013846 | [2022/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021250584 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3990769 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/72, F02K1/60 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
F02K1/72 (EP,US);
F02K1/68 (CN,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F02K1/60 (EP,US);
F05D2250/411 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | SCHUBUMKEHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ANTRIEBSSYSTEM EINES MANTELSTROMTRIEBWERKS EINES FLUGZEUGS UND SCHUBUMKEHRVERFAHREN | [2022/18] | English: | THRUST REVERSER FOR TURBOFAN PROPULSION SYSTEM OF AN AIRCRAFT AND THRUST REVERSAL METHOD | [2022/18] | French: | INVERSEUR DE POUSSÉE POUR SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE RÉACTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX D'UN AÉRONEF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INVERSION DE POUSSÉE ASSOCIÉ | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/18] | INVERSEUR DE POUSSÉE POUR SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE RÉACTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX D'UN AÉRONEF ET SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE RÉACTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX ET PROCÉDÉ D'INVERSION DE POUSSÉE ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP22175600.0 / EP4071341 | EP22175604.2 / EP4071342 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2933890 (MORRISON JOHN A) [X] 1,8,17,18 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]DE1937679 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [A] 1-18* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2014061332 (DEZEUSTRE NICOLAS [FR], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0121] - [0129]; figures 7,8a,8b,9 *; | [Y]US2016363097 (FOUTCH DAVID W [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2017198658 (HIGGINS ROGER [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,11-13,16-18 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figures 3A,3B,4,5,7 *; | [XY]US2019284952 (GARDES PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,11-13,16-18 * paragraphs [0035] - [0057]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 10,15 |