EP4164835 - METHODS FOR LASER PROCESSING COATED SUBSTRATES USING A TOP-HAT ENERGY DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOEHM, Sandra 80689 Munich / DE | 02 /
STUTE, Uwe 31535 Neustadt am Rübenberge / DE | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21734593.3 | 26.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021US34127 | Priority number, date | US202063037126P | 10.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063037126 P | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252182 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164835 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/53, C03B33/09 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
B23K26/53 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0622 (KR,US);
B23K26/0648 (KR,US);
B23K26/0734 (KR,US);
B23K26/082 (US);
B23K26/18 (US);
C03B33/0222 (EP,KR);
C03B33/04 (EP,KR);
C03B33/074 (EP,KR);
C03B33/091 (EP,KR);
B23K2101/34 (US);
B23K2103/54 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LASERBEARBEITUNG BESCHICHTETER SUBSTRATE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER HUTENERGIEVERTEILUNG | [2023/16] | English: | METHODS FOR LASER PROCESSING COATED SUBSTRATES USING A TOP-HAT ENERGY DISTRIBUTION | [2023/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT AU LASER DE SUBSTRATS REVÊTUS À L'AIDE D'UNE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE OMÉGA | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19962906 (SCHOTT SPEZIALGLAS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2015165563 (MANLEY ROBERT GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2019300417 (STUTE UWE [DE]) | by applicant | NL2017998B | US19370624023 |