EP4168141 - RECONSTRUCTING MIXED REALITY CONTEXTUALLY DERIVED ACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Erik A. Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PAULOVICH, Jonathan Gustav Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SCHULTZ, Michael William Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
PIERPONT, Dylan Edmund Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MARICICH, Gabriel Robert Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
HARRISON, Charles L. Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
OMOTANI, Todd A. Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
HEASLEY, Kathleen Carol Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21734631.1 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021US34666 | Priority number, date | US202016906802 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: US202016906802 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021257266 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168141 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/211, A63F13/212, A63F13/213, A63F13/215, A63F13/25, A63F13/428, A63F13/5255, G06F3/01 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A63F13/211 (EP);
G06F11/323 (US);
A63F13/212 (EP);
A63F13/213 (EP);
A63F13/215 (EP);
A63F13/25 (EP);
A63F13/428 (EP);
A63F13/5255 (EP);
G06F11/302 (US);
G06F11/3438 (US);
G06F16/245 (US);
G06F16/248 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | REKONSTRUKTION VON KONTEXTUELL ABGELEITETEN AKTIONEN DER GEMISCHTEN REALITÄT | [2023/17] | English: | RECONSTRUCTING MIXED REALITY CONTEXTUALLY DERIVED ACTIONS | [2023/17] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION D'ACTIONS DÉRIVÉES CONTEXTUELLEMENT D'UNE RÉALITÉ MIXTE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 08.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2014267611 (KENNETT DANIEL G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 77] , [ 163] * * figure 3b * [Y] 4,10 [I] 3,9; | [Y]US2020188028 (FEINER STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 4,10 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] , [00 7] , [0 28] *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Walking - Wikipedia", (20150802), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Walking&oldid=674211580, (20181116), XP055524460 [A] 3,9 * first sentence * |