EP4150750 - POWER CONVERTER WITH COMMON MODE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUPP, Henrik 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KOPF, Michael 90537 Feucht / DE | 03 /
STEINMÜLLER, Stefan 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21735172.5 | 08.06.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP65294 | Priority number, date | EP20200189369 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20189369 | [2023/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028754 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150750 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H02M1/126 (EP);
H02M1/123 (EP,US);
H02M1/0064 (US);
H02M3/33576 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | STROMRICHTER MIT GLEICHTAKTFILTER | [2023/12] | English: | POWER CONVERTER WITH COMMON MODE FILTER | [2023/12] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE AVEC FILTRE DE MODE COMMUN | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29506951U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2001197665 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [XAYI]WO03105328 (EPCOS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 19 - page 8, line 12; figures 1-5,7 * [A] 12,13 [Y] 6-8,14 [I] 10,11; | [Y]US2007296374 (BAUDESSON PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [Y] 14* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050]; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP1971016 (VACON OYJ [FI]) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2482437 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [Y] 7 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP3109987 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CT EUROPE BV [NL], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [X]US2017230027 (OSWALD DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0059] * |