EP4167775 - NON-COMBUSTIBLE AEROSOL DELIVERY SYSTEM, FILTER UNIT AND ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASPARYAN, Hripsime London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
COPLEY, Simon James Cambridgeshire PE27 4LG / GB | 03 /
AHEARN, Daniel Thomas Cambridgeshire PE27 4LG / GB | 04 /
STEPHENS, Francesca Alys Cambridgeshire PE27 4LG / GB | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Allen, Caroline Margaret Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21736663.2 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021GB51532 | Priority number, date | GB20200009252 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202009252 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021255455 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167775 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F13/00, A24D3/17, A24F40/485 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A24D3/17 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (KR);
A61M15/06 (US);
A24B15/165 (KR);
A24B15/302 (KR);
A24D3/063 (KR);
A24D3/08 (KR);
A24D3/16 (KR);
A24F13/00 (EP,KR);
A24F40/10 (KR);
A24F40/485 (EP,KR);
A24F7/02 (KR);
A24F7/04 (KR);
A61M11/041 (US);
A24F40/48 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FREISETZUNG EINES NICHT BRENNBAREN AEROSOLS, FILTEREINHEIT UND ANORDNUNG | [2023/17] | English: | NON-COMBUSTIBLE AEROSOL DELIVERY SYSTEM, FILTER UNIT AND ASSEMBLY | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'AÉROSOL NON COMBUSTIBLE, UNITÉ DE FILTRE ET ENSEMBLE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO9423600 (ROTHMANS BENSON & HEDGES [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,7,15,17,21,22,25 * page 31, line 7 - line 21; figure -; claim - * * page 26, line 7 - page 27, line 16 * [A] 8-14,18-20 [I] 16; | [XAI]WO2015184250 (CAROLINA VAPORDOM LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,18,21,25 * page 9, line 3 - line 26; figure -; claim - * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 21 * [A] 7,14 [I] 8-13,15-17,19,20; | [XAI]US2019247606 (WILLIAMS SAMUEL ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,15,17,18,20-22,25 * paragraph [0006]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * [A] 8-14 [I] 19; | [XAI]WO2019191840 (PERRINS ROB [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,18,21,22,25 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047]; figure -; claim - * [A] 7-14 [I] 15-17,19,20; | [XP]EP3721726 (NERUDIA LTD [GB]) [XP] 1,3,5-7,15,18,21,22,25* paragraph [0057]; figure -; claim - * |