EP4168616 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF NONWOVEN FABRIC, AND ASSOCIATED NONWOVEN FABRIC PRODUCTION APPARATUS AND NONWOVEN BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NVH Czech S.R.O. CT Park Dobranov 173 471 21 Ceská Lípa - Dobranov / CZ | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Wonku Suwon, Gyunggi-Do 16336 / KR | 02 /
NICOLAI, Norbert 46514 Schermbeck / DE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21736967.7 | 15.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021DE100511 | Priority number, date | DE202010116315 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020116315 | [2023/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254565 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168616 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4168616 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/732, D04H1/74, D04H1/54, D04H1/542 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
D04H1/732 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/54 (EP);
D04H1/542 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/558 (US);
D04H1/74 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | D04H1/732, D04H1/74, D04H1/54, D04H1/542, B60N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES FASERVLIES-HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE FASERVLIES-HERSTELLUNGSANORDNUNG UND FASERVLIESPLATINE | [2023/17] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF NONWOVEN FABRIC, AND ASSOCIATED NONWOVEN FABRIC PRODUCTION APPARATUS AND NONWOVEN BOARD | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION CONTINUE D'UN TISSU NON TISSÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE TISSU NON TISSÉ ASSOCIÉ ET PANNEAU NON TISSÉ | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 09.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |