EP4157746 - TIPPING CONTAINER FOR COLLECTION AND TRANSPORT OF INDUSTRIAL MATERIALS AND PACKAGING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solazzi Enrico e Solazzi Gianni S.N.C. Via Cav. Giovan Battista Bordogna 11 25012 Calvisano (BS) / IT | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLAZZI, Gianni 25012 Calvisano (BS) / IT | 02 /
SOLAZZI, Enrico 25010 Isorella (BS) / IT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Viale Roma, 3 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21737141.8 | 25.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021IB54506 | Priority number, date | IT20200012244 | 25.05.2020 Original published format: IT202000012244 | [2023/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021240351 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157746 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4157746 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G7/08, B65D88/02, B65D88/12, B65D88/56, B65D90/00, B65G65/23 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
B65D88/56 (EP);
B65D88/025 (EP);
B65D88/123 (EP);
B65D90/0033 (EP);
B65G65/23 (EP);
B65G7/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | B65D88/02, B61D9/00, B65D88/12, B65D88/56, B65D90/00, B65G65/23 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KIPPBEHÄLTER ZUM SAMMELN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON INDUSTRIEMATERIALIEN UND VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/14] | English: | TIPPING CONTAINER FOR COLLECTION AND TRANSPORT OF INDUSTRIAL MATERIALS AND PACKAGING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/14] | French: | CONTENEUR BASCULANT PERMETTANT LA COLLECTE ET LE TRANSPORT DE MATÉRIAUX INDUSTRIELS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH624636 (STEBLER SANER AG [CH]); | [A]DE3912409 (BAUMANN VERWERTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202004004155U (DENIOS AG [DE]); | [A]WO2007028194 (CHECKMATE INTERNAT PTY LTD [AU], et al) |