EP4161570 - MODIFIED BETACORONAVIRUS SPIKE PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIANCUCCI, Marco Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 02 /
KARPIAK, Joel David Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 03 /
LALIBERTE, Jason Paul Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 04 /
LOWEGARD, Anna Ulrika Stevenage Hertfordshire / GB | 05 /
MALITO, Enrico Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 06 /
WAHOME, Newton Muchugu Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21737144.2 | 04.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021IB54903 | Priority number, date | US202063035319P | 05.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063035319 P | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245611 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161570 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/215, C07K14/165 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/165 (US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/215 (US);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (EP);
A61K2039/55566 (EP);
A61K2039/575 (EP,US);
C12N2770/20022 (EP);
C12N2770/20034 (EP);
C12N2770/20071 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE SPIKE-PROTEINE DES BETACORONAVIRUS | [2023/15] | English: | MODIFIED BETACORONAVIRUS SPIKE PROTEINS | [2023/15] | French: | PROTÉINES MODIFIÉES DE SPICULE DE CORONAVIRUS BÊTA | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005056585 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [I] 1-29 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:3 has 81.88 % identity (90.87 % similarity) over 734 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 388-1121:201-929) with subject EPOP:CS123518 (length: 1055) from WO2005056585-A2/9 published on 2005-06-23.The query sequence SEQ ID NO:3 has 81.88 % identity (90.87 % similarity) over 734 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 388-1121:201-929) with subject EPOP:CS123518 (length: 1055) from WO2005056585-A2/9 published on 2005-06-23.; page 18 - page 43; tables 1-3 *; | [I]WO2006068663 (ID BIOMEDICAL CORP QUEBEC [CA], et al) [I] 1-29 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:3 has 88.62 % identity (96.72 % similarity) over 457 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 665-1121:1-457) with subject EPOP:CS500204 (length: 523) from WO2006068663-A2/22 published on 2006-06-29. *; | [I]US2018334480 (GERSHONI JONATHAN [IL]) [I] 1-29 * pages 5-6; figures 1-13 *; | [I] - ROBERT N. KIRCHDOERFER ET AL, "Stabilized coronavirus spikes are resistant to conformational changes induced by receptor recognition or proteolysis", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20181024), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-018-34171-7, XP055734535 [I] 1-29 * page 1 - page 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-018-34171-7 | [I] - RENE BARRO-SORIA ET AL, "KCNE1 and KCNE3 modulate KCNQ1 channels by affecting different gating transitions", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20170814), vol. 114, no. 35, doi:10.1073/pnas.1710335114, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E7367 - E7376, XP055745969 [I] 1-29 * page E7367 - page E7376 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1710335114 | by applicant | US4436727 | US4912094 | US5057540 | US4912094 | EP0382271 | WO9517210 | WO9611711 | WO9633739 | EP0822831 | WO9850399 | WO0134617 | WO0190129 | WO0212258 | WO03065806 | WO03066065 | WO2004062599 | WO2005113782 | WO2005121330 | WO2006012425 | WO2006016997 | WO2007039451 | WO2007068907 | WO2011076807 | US2011229507 | WO2012006380 | WO2012006376 | WO2012006359 | WO2012006378 | WO2012030901 | WO2012031046 | WO2012031043 | WO2012049317 | WO2012051211 | WO2012080369 | WO2013006834 | WO2013006837 | WO2013006825 | WO2013033563 | WO2013044203 | US2013216613 | WO2014136086 | WO2015048149 | WO2015095340 | WO2015095346 | WO2015156870 | WO2016037154 | WO2016037053 | WO2016092460 | WO2018005558 | WO2018081318 | WO2018104919 | US2018265551 | WO2020079586 | - GRIFONI et al., Cell, (20200000), vol. 181, no. 2, pages 281 - 292.e6 | - CUI et al., Nat. Rev. Microbiol., (20190000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 181 - 192 | - XIONG et al., Nat Struct Mol Biol, (20200000), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 934 - 941 | - LETKO et al., Nat. Microbio., (20200000), vol. 5, pages 562 - 569 | - MADHI et al., N Engl J Med, (20210000), vol. 384, pages 1885 - 1898 | - HSEIH et al., Science, (20200000), vol. 369, no. 6510, pages 1501 - 1505 | - YUAN et al., Nat. Comm., (20170000), vol. 8, no. 15092, page 9 | - BRUFSKY, J Med Virol, (20200420), page 7 | - PINTO et al., Nature, (20200000), vol. 579, pages 265 - 269 | - MA et al., PLoS Path., (20110000), vol. 7, no. 9, page e 1002200 | - PLEBANSKI et al., Expert Rev. Vaccines, (20100000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 596 - 600 | - TODRYK, Vaccines (Basel, (20180000), vol. 6, no. 4, page 84 | - FOLDSSCHMITZ, J. Allergy Clinical Immunology, (20030000), vol. 111, no. 2, pages S702 - S711 | - FALCHETTI et al., Immunology, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 346 - 351 | - CLAPP et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20110000), vol. 100, no. 2, pages 388 - 401 | - ROSSI et al., Infect. Immun., (20160000), vol. 84, no. 6, pages 1735 - 1742 | - BRUYLANTS et al., Curr. Med. Chem., (20050000), vol. 12, pages 2011 - 2020 | - THOMAS et al., Hum. Vaccin. Immunother., (20130000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 744 - 752 | - ZHENG BJ et al., Hong Kong Med J, (20080000), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 39 - 43 | - DU L. et al., Nat. Rev. Microbio., (20090000), vol. 7, pages 226 - 236 | - WANG et al., Antiviral Research, (20160000), vol. 133, pages 165 - 177 | - Nat. Microbiol., (20200000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 536 - 544 | - 2020, Nat. Microbiol., vol. 5, no. 4, pages 536 - 544 | - LI F. et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 309, no. 5742, pages 1864 - 1868 | - MULLAN, Briefings in Bioinformatics, (20050000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 113 - 115 | - DAUGELAITE et al., ISRN Biomathematics 2013, (20130000), page 14 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 443 - 453 | - RICE et al., Trends Genetics, (20000000), vol. 16, pages 276 - 277 | - FOLLIS et al., Virology, (20060000), vol. 350, pages 358 - 369 | - MILLETWHITTAKER, PNAS, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 42, pages 15214 - 15219 | - RATHI et al., PLOS ONE, (20150000), vol. 19, no. 7, page e0130289 | - MCLELLAN et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 340, no. 6158, pages 711 - 716 | - TIRADOYOON, Viral Immunol., (20030000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 69 - 86 | - WALLS et al., Cell, (20190000), vol. 176, pages 1026 - 1039 | - RAJUPUT et al., "Adjuvant effects of saponins on animal immune responses", J Zhejiang Univ Sci. B., (20070000), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1631/jzus.2007.B0153, pages 153 - 161, XP019486906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1631/jzus.2007.B0153 | - LAHIRI et al., Vaccine, (20080000), vol. 26, page 6777 | - FOX et al., Clin. Vaccine Immunol, (20120000), vol. 19, page 1633 | - ALVING et al., Curr Opin in Immunol, (20120000), vol. 24, page 310 | - LACAILLE-DUBOISWAGNER, "A review of the biological and pharmacological activities of saponins", Phytomedicine, (19960000), vol. 2, page 363, XP000993545 | - "Saponin adjuvants", DALSGAARD et al., Archiv. fur die gesamte Virusforschung, Springer Verlag, (19740000), vol. 44, page 243 | - KENSIL et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 146, page 431 | - KENSIL, C. R., "Saponins as vaccine adjuvants", Crit Rev Ther Drug Carrier Syst, (19960000), vol. 12, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 55 | - R. I. FRESHNEY, Culture of Animal Cells: A Manual of Basic Technique, The Humana Press Inc., (19870000), pages 109 - 128 | - BRUUN et al., ACS Nano, (20180000), vol. 12, no. 9, pages 8855 - 8866 | - LI et al., JNanobiotechnol, (20190000), vol. 17, no. 13 | - WANG et al., FEBS Open Bio, (20170000), vol. 7, no. 8, page 1196 | - KANEKIYO et al., Nature, (20130000), vol. 499, no. 7456, page 102 | - LI et al., Ind. Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 2, pages 143 - 47 | - HSIA et al., Nature, (20160000), vol. 535, no. 7610, pages 136 - 139 | - GEALL et al., PNAS USA, (20120904), vol. 109, no. 36, pages 14604 - 9 | - LE et al., Nat Rev Drug Disc, (20200000), vol. 19, pages 305 - 306 | - MOKREJS, MARTIN et al., "IRESite: the database of experimentally verified IRES structures (World Wide Web. iresite. org", Nucleic acids research, (20060000), vol. 34, no. l, pages D125 - D130 | - SZYMCZAK et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 589 - 594 | - DONNELLY et al., JGen Virol., (20010000), vol. 82, pages 1013 - 25 | - SONG et al., Structure, (20130000), vol. 21, pages 1735 - 1742 | - DIMAIO et al., PLoS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 6, page e20450 | - SHEFFLERBAKER, Protein Science, (20090000), vol. 18, pages 229 - 239 | - GOLDENZWEIG et al., Molecular Cell, (20160000), vol. 63, no. 2, pages 337 - 346 | - CANNON et al., Protein Science, (20200000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 919 - 929 | - GUI et al., Cell Research, (20170000), vol. 27, pages 119 - 129 | - KIRCHDOERFER et al., Sci Rep, (20180000), vol. 8, page 17823 | - PALLESEN et al., PNAS, (20170000), vol. 114, no. 17, pages E7348 - E7357 | - SONG et al., PLoS Path, (20180000), vol. 14, no. 8, page e 1007236 | - TIAN et al., Emerg. Microbes Infect., (20200000), vol. 9, pages 382 - 385 | - YASUI et al., Cytokine, (20080000), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 302 - 306 | - JUAME et al., J. Virol., (20110000), vol. 85, pages 10582 - 10597 | - WANG et al., Circ Res., (20140000), vol. 114, no. 3, pages 421 - 433 | - WAN et al., J. of Virol, (20200000), vol. 94, no. 7, pages e00127 - 20 | - HALLEN et al., Computational Chemistry, (20180000), vol. 39, no. 30, pages 2492 - 2507 | - CLARK et al., JMB, (20190000), vol. 431, no. 7, pages 1481 - 1493 | - STEINBRECHER et al., JMB, (20170000), vol. 429, no. 7, pages 948 - 964 | - FRONING2020 et al., Nat. Comm., vol. 11, no. 2330, page 14 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. JX869059.2 | - YANG et al., Virol Immunol, (20140000), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 543 - 550 | WO2006EP66507 | WO2015US11534 | WO2017US39595 | WO2017US58370 | WO2019IB58777 |