EP4364102 - METHOD FOR TRAINING AND USING A DEEP LEARNING ALGORITHM TO COMPARE MEDICAL IMAGES BASED ON DIMENSIONALITY-REDUCED REPRESENTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSER, Christoph 81829 Munich / DE | 02 /
BRIEU, Nicolas 81829 Munich / DE | 03 /
LIU, Qianyu 81829 Munich / DE | 04 /
PUCH GINER, Santiago 81829 Munich / DE | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 21737648.2 | 29.06.2021 | [2024/19] | WO2021EP67878 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274512 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364102 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/82, G06F18/40 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06F18/213 (EP);
G06F18/22 (EP);
G06V2201/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRAINIEREN UND VERWENDUNG EINES TIEFENLERNALGORITHMUS ZUM VERGLEICH MEDIZINISCHER BILDER AUF DER BASIS VON DIMENSIONALITÄTSREDUZIERTEN DARSTELLUNGEN | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD FOR TRAINING AND USING A DEEP LEARNING ALGORITHM TO COMPARE MEDICAL IMAGES BASED ON DIMENSIONALITY-REDUCED REPRESENTATIONS | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE ET D'UTILISATION D'UN ALGORITHME D'APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND POUR COMPARER DES IMAGES MÉDICALES SUR LA BASE DE REPRÉSENTATIONS À DIMENSIONNALITÉ RÉDUITE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010329529 (FELDMAN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15,16,18,20,21 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0035] , [0063] , [0064] , [0 78] - [0085] - [0098] , [0109] - [0127] - [0131] , [0132] , [0151] , [0156] * * paragraphs [0192] , [0204] , [0206] , [0238] * [I] 13,14,17,19; | [I] - GHASSAN HAMARNEH ET AL, "Perception-Based Visualization of Manifold-Valued Medical Images Using Distance-Preserving Dimensionality Reduction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE, USA, (20110701), vol. 30, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TMI.2011.2111422, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 1314 - 1327, XP011356982 [I] 1-21 * Section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2011.2111422 | [I] - "A Meta-Classifier for Detecting Prostate Cancer by Quantitative Integration of In Vivo Magnetic Resonance Spectroscopy and Magnetic Resonance Imaging", MEDICAL IMAGING 2008: COMPUTER-AIDED DIAGNOSIS, (20080317), XP040435015 [I] 1-21 * Section 2; Section 3; Section 4 * | [I] - TIWARI PALLAVI ET AL, Consensus-Locally Linear Embedding (C-LLE): Application to Prostate Cancer Detection on Magnetic Resonance Spectroscopy, ADVANCES IN BIOMETRICS : INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, ICB 2007, SEOUL, KOREA, AUGUST 27 - 29, 2007 ; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 330 - 338, (20080906), ISBN 978-3-540-74549-5, XP047462376 [I] 1-21 * Section 2; Section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-85990-1_40 | [A] - G. E. HINTON ET AL, "Reducing the Dimensionality of Data with Neural Networks", SCIENCE, US, (20060728), vol. 313, no. 5786, doi:10.1126/science.1127647, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 504 - 507, XP055313000 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1127647 | by applicant | - I. GOODFELLOWY. BENGIOA. COURVILLE, Deep learning, chapter convolutional networks, (20160000), URL: http://www.deeplearningbook.org | - J. WU, Introduction to convolutional neural networks, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/450c/a19932fcef1ca6d0442cbf52fec38fb9d1e5.pdf | - Common loss functions in machine learning, (20190822), URL: https://towardsdatascience.com/common-loss-functions-in-machine-learning-46af0ffc4d23 | - ALEX KRIZHEVSKYILYA SUTSKEVERGEOFFREY E. HINTON, Imagenet classification with deep convolutional neural networks, URL: http://papers.nips.cc/paper/4824-imagenet-classification-with-deep-convolutional-neural-networks.pdf | - S. RENK. HER. GIRSHICKJ. SUN, Faster r-cnn: Towards real-time object detection with region proposal networks, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1506.01497.pdf | - S.-E. WEIV. RAMAKRISHNAT. KANADEY. SHEIKH, Convolutional pose machines, URL: https://arxiv.0rg/pdf/1602.00134.pdf | - JONATHAN LONGEVAN SHELHAMERTREVOR DARRELL, Fully convolutional networks for semantic segmentation, URL: https://www.cv-foundation.org/openaccess/content_cvpr_2015/papers/Long_Fully_Convolutional_Networks_2015_CVPR_paper.pdf | - HOFFER, E. et al., "Deep Metric Learning using Triplet Network", arXiv: 1412.6622 |