EP4161427 - ROBOTIC REFERENCE FRAMES FOR NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazor Robotics Ltd. 5 Shacham Street North Industrial Park 3079567 Caesarea / IL | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLMAN, Aviv 3079567 Caesarea / IL | 02 /
JUNIO, Dany 3079567 CAESAREA / IL | 03 /
PUCKETT, Katherine M. Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21737848.8 | 03.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021US35667 | Priority number, date | US202063036130P | 08.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063036130 P | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252263 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161427 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B90/00, A61B90/50 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B90/39 (EP);
A61B90/50 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP);
A61B2034/2055 (EP);
A61B2090/3945 (EP);
A61B2090/3983 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHE REFERENZRAHMEN ZUR NAVIGATION | [2023/15] | English: | ROBOTIC REFERENCE FRAMES FOR NAVIGATION | [2023/15] | French: | CADRES DE RÉFÉRENCE ROBOTIQUES POUR NAVIGATION | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010168562 (ZHAO TAO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10-13,15-18,20 * figures 1,9 * * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] * [I] 4; | [XY]US2019000569 (CRAWFORD NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-21 * figures 3,5,6 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0095] , [0122] , [0123] , [0125] , [0141] * [Y] 22; | [XY]WO2019071189 (GYS TECH LLC D/B/A CARDAN ROBOTICS [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-15 * figures 1,8A-C * * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0050] , [0064] , [0112] *[Y] 22; | [XI]US2020038116 (TOPOREK GRZEGORZ ANDRZEJ [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10,13,15 * figures 1,2A,2C * * paragraphs [0037] , [0053] , [0065] , [0067] , [0069] , [0072] , [0073] * [I] 4 |