EP4087666 - IDENTIFYING A LOCATION FOR A STRIKER OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topgolf International, Inc. 8750 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1200 Dallas, Texas 75231 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKSTROM, Per, Dennis Fridhemsgaten 68A S-112 46 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
CEDERLOO, Johan, Peter Ekensbergsvagen 118 S-117 69 Stockholm / SE | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21738128.4 | 05.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12202 | Priority number, date | US202062957766P | 06.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062957766 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141912 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087666 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63B24/00, A63B57/00, A63B71/06, G01S5/22 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H04N13/239 (EP);
A63B24/0021 (US);
A63B69/3694 (US);
A63B71/0622 (US);
G06F3/14 (US);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06F3/165 (US);
G10L21/0232 (US);
G10L25/51 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0031 (US);
A63B2024/0096 (US);
A63B2071/0638 (US);
A63B2071/0694 (US);
A63B2220/808 (US);
A63B2220/89 (US);
A63B2225/50 (US);
G06T7/292 (US);
G09G2340/12 (EP);
G09G2340/14 (EP);
G10L21/0208 (EP);
H04N13/204 (US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES ORTES FÜR EINEN SCHLÄGER EINES OBJEKTES | [2022/46] | English: | IDENTIFYING A LOCATION FOR A STRIKER OF AN OBJECT | [2022/46] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'EMPLACEMENT POUR FRAPPEUR D'OBJET | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016074735 (DAWE WAYNE [CA], et al) [Y] 8* paragraph [0004] *; | [IAY]GB2567800 (SOCIAL ENTERTAINMENT VENTURES LTD [GB]) [I] 1-4,6,9-15 * page 18, line 14 - line 16 * * figure 1 * * claims 1, 2 * * page 7, line 3 - line 12 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 8 | International search | [A]US2008021651 (SEELEY JOHN RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-16* claims 1-9 *; | [Y]US2016306036 (JOHNSON HENRI [US]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009]-[0063] *; | [A]US2017136336 (VOLLBRECHT JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0019]-[0036] *; | [Y]KR20170118061 (ALPHAWAVE GOLF (PTY) LTD [ZA]) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US2018318644 (FORSGREN DANIEL [SE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024]-[0062] * |