EP4171409 - TOOL APPLICATION POINT WITH ORIENTATION AID FOR SCREW ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mimeo Medical GmbH Eierwiesenstrasse 30 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUER, Frank 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21739581.3 | 23.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021EP67103 | Priority number, date | DE20201003774 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020003774 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259978 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171409 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/86, A61B17/88, A61B17/70, F16B23/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/8615 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (US);
A61B17/888 (EP);
F16B23/003 (EP);
F16B23/0038 (EP);
F16B23/0076 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGANSATZSTELLE MIT AUSRICHTHILFE FÜR SCHRAUBENELEMENTE | [2023/18] | English: | TOOL APPLICATION POINT WITH ORIENTATION AID FOR SCREW ELEMENTS | [2023/18] | French: | EMPLACEMENT D'INSERTION D'OUTIL ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE AIDE À L'ORIENTATION POUR ÉLÉMENTS VIS | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 24.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5171117 (SEIDL RICHARD J [US]); | [A]EP0626277 (ALPINA RAGGI SPA [IT]); | [A]DE102013105744 (AESCULAP AG [DE]); | [XDY]EP2932929 (BIEDERMANN TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP2932929 |