EP4182991 - BATTERY PACK WITH POUCH CELL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Klaus 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE | 02 /
LEPIORZ, Matthias 09112 Chemnitz / DE | 03 /
ENDER, Moses 9470 Buchs / CH | 04 /
MARTINY, Nora 82211 Herrsching-Breitbrunn / DE | 05 /
STANGER, Robert 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | 06 /
ZIEGLER, Bernd 86830 Schabmünchen / DE | 07 /
SAX, Kathrin 86937 Scheuring / DE | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21739667.0 | 05.07.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021EP68509 | Priority number, date | EP20200186137 | 16.07.2020 Original published format: EP 20186137 | [2023/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022012992 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182991 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4182991 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/647, H01M10/61, H02J7/00, H01M50/116, H01M50/20 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H01M10/4264 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H01M10/482 (US);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M50/105 (EP,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/574 (US);
H02J7/0031 (EP);
H02J7/00719 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2010/4278 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKKUPACK MIT POUCHZELLE UND VERFAHREN | [2023/21] | English: | BATTERY PACK WITH POUCH CELL AND METHOD | [2023/21] | French: | BLOC D'ACCUMULATEUR POURVU D'ÉLÉMENT À POCHE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/21] | BATTERIE COMPRENANT UNE CELLULE EN SACHET SOUPLE ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 16.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016226042 (HARTMANN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0099] * * figure 4c *; | [A]DE102015208252 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * claims 1-18 *; | [A]EP3121870 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 2,3,4a-4c, 5a-5c,10 * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO2017087807 (UNIV MICHIGAN REGENTS [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * claims 1-54 ** figure 1 *; | [AD]EP3591739 (HILTI AG [LI]) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] * * claims 1-11 * * figure 4 * | by applicant | EP3588607 | EP3591739 |