EP4185811 - DOOR AND DOMESTIC COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNAUER, Maximilian 83361 Kienberg / DE | 02 /
DUBOIS, Frederic 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
HÖRNER, Wolfgang 83278 Traunstein / DE | 04 /
JELL, Peter 83254 Breitbrunn / DE | 05 /
SCHUECK, Anja 83301 Traunreut / DE | 06 /
THALLER, Christine 83329 Waging / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21740051.4 | 07.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021EP68837 | Priority number, date | DE202010209245 | 22.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020209245 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017794 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185811 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F24C15/021 (EP);
F24C15/045 (US);
F24C15/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | TÜR UND HAUSHALTSGARGERÄT | [2023/22] | English: | DOOR AND DOMESTIC COOKING DEVICE | [2023/22] | French: | PORTE ET APPAREIL MÉNAGER DE CUISSON | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2063463 (FRANCAIS ISOLANTS) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102005024426 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [Y]DE102014223551 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10-14 * paragraph [0039]; figures 2, 5 *; | [Y]DE102016224305 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [00 9]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102016224708 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4 * |