EP4211047 - SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER CLOSURE, AND CONTAINER CLOSURE HAVING A SEALING CAP OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protechna S.A. Avenue de la Gare 14 1701 Fribourg / CH | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLATT, Bernd 56412 Ruppach-Goldhausen / DE | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Bahnhofstrasse 4 57072 Siegen / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21740516.6 | 08.07.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021EP69054 | Priority number, date | DE202010123861 | 14.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020123861 | [2023/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053202 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211047 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D39/08, B65D55/08 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B65D55/0863 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B65D41/58 (US);
B65D39/025 (US);
B65D39/082 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B65D41/04 (KR);
B65D51/18 (KR);
B65D2401/25 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Validation states | MA | 22.02.2023 | Title | German: | SIEGELKAPPE FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS SOWIE BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS MIT EINER DERARTIGEN SIEGELKAPPE | [2023/29] | English: | SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER CLOSURE, AND CONTAINER CLOSURE HAVING A SEALING CAP OF THIS TYPE | [2023/29] | French: | CAPSULE DE FERMETURE POUR LA FERMETURE D'UN RÉCIPIENT ET FERMETURE DE RÉCIPIENT POURVUE D'UNE TELLE CAPSULE DE FERMETURE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010301046 (SCHUETZ UDO [DE]) [X] 1-7* figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2016272385 (KLATT BERND [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2019344942 (KLATT BERND [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | WO2008139196 |