EP4092875 - ALLOY COMPOSITION, ALLOY POWDER, ALLOY RIBBON, INDUCTOR, AND MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 110, Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Su Min 110 Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Choongnyun Paul 110 Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21740775.8 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021KR00638 | Priority number, date | KR20200006224 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006224 | KR20200006225 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006225 | KR20200006228 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006228 | [2022/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145741 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092875 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/153, H01F5/02, H01F3/00, H01F5/00, H02K1/02, H01F27/28, H01F27/24 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01F3/08 (EP);
H02K1/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/005 (US);
C22C38/02 (US);
C22C38/16 (US);
H01F1/15308 (EP);
H01F1/15333 (EP);
H01F3/04 (EP);
H02K1/12 (US);
H02K1/22 (US);
H02K5/04 (US);
C22C2202/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | H02K1/02, H01F1/153, H01F5/00, H01F27/28, H01F3/00, H01F27/24, H01F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | LEGIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG, LEGIERUNGSPULVER, LEGIERUNGSBAND, INDUKTOR UND MOTOR | [2022/47] | English: | ALLOY COMPOSITION, ALLOY POWDER, ALLOY RIBBON, INDUCTOR, AND MOTOR | [2022/47] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ALLIAGE, POUDRE D'ALLIAGE, RUBAN D'ALLIAGE, INDUCTEUR ET MOTEUR | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2022 | Translation filed | 12.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007175545 (URATA AKIRI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-39 *; | [XI]WO2017086102 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0035] , [0039] , [0040] , [0051] , [0058] - [0060] - [0169] * [I] 3,4,14,15; | [XI]US2019362871 (URATA AKIRI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-13 * paragraphs [0040] , [0052] , [0053]; claims 1,11 * [I] 3,7,8,14,15 | International search | [A]US2007175545 (URATA AKIRI [JP], et al) [A] 1-33* See paragraphs [0083]-[0093]; and figure 4. *; | [Y]JP2007270271 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [Y] 12-15,23-26 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0031]; and claim 1. *; | [Y]KR20120114850 (AMOGREENTECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 24,25 * See paragraphs [0001]-[0003] and [0027]. *; | [Y]KR20160018013 (TM NANO TECH LTD [KR]) [Y] 15,26 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0028]. *; | [A]JP6506854B (ALPSALPINE CO., LTD. et al.) [A] 1-11,16-22,27-33 |