EP4018784 - COOKING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Jiho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Gyeongjin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Eonjoong 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Inki 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21740938.2 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/26] | WO2021KR00621 | Priority number, date | KR20200006699 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006699 | KR20200058403 | 15.05.2020 Original published format: KR 20200058403 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145733 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018784 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/64, H05B3/06, H05B1/02, H05B6/80 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H05B6/80 (EP);
H05B6/647 (US);
H05B1/0263 (EP,US);
H05B3/06 (EP);
H05B3/42 (US);
H05B6/6482 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H05B6/64, H05B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | KOCHGERÄT | [2022/26] | English: | COOKING APPLIANCE | [2022/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 06.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2302462 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2004232141 (YAMASAKI TAKAHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0102] *; | [XY]JP5899426B (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1-3,10-12,15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0039] , [0040] , [0046]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-9,13,14; | [Y]US2018324908 (DENKER DENNIS [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,9,14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0095]; figure 5A *; | [A]WO2019244802 (AGC INC [JP]) [A] 6* paragraph [0058]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2001076854 (SAKAGUCHI ELECTRIC HEATERS) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0008], [0015] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]JP2004108606 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-9 and figure 4. *; | [Y]KR20070108022 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0059] and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2016242240 (LEE YOUNGJUN [KR], et al) [Y] 6,10-13 * See paragraph [0043] and figures 2-6. *; | [Y]US2018340692 (KWAG DONGSEONG [KR], et al) [Y] 11-13 * See paragraph [0019] and figure 2. * | by applicant | GB2302462 | US2004232141 | JP5899426B | US2018324908 |