EP4090649 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TARGETED PROTEIN STABILIZATION BY REDIRECTING ENDOGENOUS DEUBIQUITINASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNER, Scott 36 W. 89th Street Apt. 3A New York, New York 10024 / US | 02 /
COLECRAFT, Henry M. 6 Witmer Way Robbinsville, New Jersey 08691 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21740951.5 | 14.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021US13382 | Priority number, date | US202062961082P | 14.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062961082 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146386 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090649 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/27, C07C233/08, C07C333/08, C07D405/12, C07D409/14 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/443 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07D409/14 (EP);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C12N15/1093 (US);
C12N9/485 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C07K14/4712 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
C07K2317/22 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP);
C07K2317/35 (US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | C07C211/27, C07C233/08, C07C333/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEZIELTEN PROTEINSTABILISIERUNG DURCH UMLENKEN ENDOGENER DEUBIQUITINASEN | [2022/47] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TARGETED PROTEIN STABILIZATION BY REDIRECTING ENDOGENOUS DEUBIQUITINASES | [2022/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE STABILISATION DE PROTÉINES CIBLÉES PAR RÉORIENTATION DE DÉSUBIQUITINASES ENDOGÈNES | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2017095457 (LONERGAN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]WO2019090234 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | [XA]WO2019238816 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB]); | [XPA]WO2020169650 (LOCKI THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]); | International search | [A]US2012077806 (DONATO NICHOLAS J [US], et al); | [YA]US2017095457 (LONERGAN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2018215731 (CREW ANDREW P [US], et al); | [A]US10351568 (FINLEY DANIEL J [US], et al); |