EP3908882 - UNDERLAYER FOR PHOTORESIST ADHESION AND DOSE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lam Research Corporation 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Jun 4650 Cushing Pkwy. Fremont, California 94538 / US | 02 /
MANUMPIL, Mary Anne 4650 Cushing Pkwy. Fremont, California 94538 / US | 03 /
LI, Da 4650 Cushing Pkwy. Fremont, California 94538 / US | 04 /
TAN, Samantha S.H. 4650 Cushing Pkwy. Fremont, California 94538 / US | 05 /
YU, Jengyi 4650 Cushing Pkwy. Fremont, California 94538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
XUE, Jun Fremont, California 94538 / US | ||
02 /
MANUMPIL, Mary Anne Fremont, California 94538 / US | |||
03 /
LI, Da Fremont, California 94538 / US | |||
04 /
TAN, Samantha S.H. Fremont, California 94538 / US | |||
05 /
YU, Jengyi Fremont, California 94538 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Kontrus, Gerhard SEZ-Strasse 1 9500 Villach / AT | Application number, filing date | 21741104.0 | 11.01.2021 | [2021/46] | WO2021US12953 | Priority number, date | US202062961647P | 15.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062961647 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146138 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908882 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, G03F7/004, G03F7/09, C23C16/22, H01J37/32, H01L21/02, H01L21/31, H01L21/67 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G03F7/091 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0332 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03F7/094 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C16/047 (US);
C23C16/22 (EP);
C23C16/26 (KR);
C23C16/505 (EP,KR);
G03F1/22 (US);
G03F7/0042 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0043 (EP);
G03F7/11 (EP,KR);
G03F7/167 (US);
G03F7/168 (KR);
G03F7/2004 (KR,US);
G03F7/32 (KR);
G03F7/36 (KR);
G03F7/38 (KR);
G03F7/70033 (CN,US);
H01J37/32174 (KR);
H01J37/32357 (EP);
H01J37/32449 (EP);
H01J37/32522 (EP);
H01J37/32651 (EP);
H01L21/02115 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02205 (KR);
H01L21/0228 (EP);
H01L21/0234 (KR);
H01L21/0274 (CN,US);
H01L21/0337 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | G03F7/00, G03F7/11, G03F7/004 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | UNTERSCHICHT FÜR DIE HAFTUNG UND DOSISREDUZIERUNG VON FOTOLACK | [2021/46] | English: | UNDERLAYER FOR PHOTORESIST ADHESION AND DOSE REDUCTION | [2021/46] | French: | SOUS-COUCHE POUR ADHÉSION DE RÉSINE PHOTOSENSIBLE ET RÉDUCTION DE DOSE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012088193 (WEIDMAN TIMOTHY W [US], et al); | [X]US2019172714 (BOBEK SARAH [US], et al); | [E]WO2021072042 (LAM RES CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US2016284559 (KIKUCHI RIE [JP], et al); | [A]US2017168398 (ZI AN-REN [TW], et al); | [A]US2018224744 (BAE SHINHYO [KR], et al); | [A]US2019129307 (KWON SOONHYUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2019137870 (MEYERS STEPHEN T [US], et al) |