EP4090754 - TUNABLE TRANSPOSON SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aridis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 983 University Avenue, Bldg. B Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGO, Kathy 411 Lewis Rd San Jose, CA 95111 / US | 02 /
WOO, Jenifer 8515 Sallas St La Mesa, CA 91942 / US | 03 /
PHAM, Binh 507 Lilac Lane Mountain Veiw, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
TRUONG-LE, Vu 2741 Dresser Court Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6QY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21741482.0 | 17.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021US13788 | Priority number, date | US202062963022P | 18.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062963022 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021146666 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4090754 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90, C12N9/16, C12N9/22, C12N15/85, C12N15/52, C12N5/16 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C12N15/907 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP);
C12N2800/30 (EP);
C12N2800/90 (EP);
C12N2830/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARE TRANSPOSONSYSTEME | [2022/47] | English: | TUNABLE TRANSPOSON SYSTEMS | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRANSPOSON AJUSTABLES | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015188191 (WONG WILSON W [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2011023143 (WEINSTEIN EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 8* Abstract; para [0017] *; | [XY]US2017152526 (FAHRENKRUG SCOTT C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9-12 * Abstract; para [0042]; para [0069]; para [0114]; para [0116-0117]; para [0120]; para [0122]; para [0138-0139]; para [0142]; para [0206-0207] * [Y] 5-6, 8; | [Y]US2018265890 (QIAN QIJUN [CN], et al) [Y] 5-6 * Abstract; para [0048]; para [0055] * |