EP4091477 - AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Ruilong Bldg. C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str., Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wei Bldg. C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str., Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Chenpan Bldg. C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str., Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
XU, Zhongli Bldg. C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str., Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
LI, Yonghai Bldg. C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str., Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741510.8 | 18.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021CN72535 | Priority number, date | CN20201056188 | 18.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010056188 | [2022/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021143909 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091477 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24F40/20, H05B3/26 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (KR);
H05B3/0052 (US);
H05B3/03 (KR);
H05B3/08 (KR);
H05B3/22 (US);
H05B3/26 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
G02B3/08 (US);
H05B2203/013 (EP,KR);
H05B2203/021 (EP);
H05B2203/03 (KR);
H05B2203/032 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | A24F40/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/47] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | Translation filed | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 07.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204335822U (HUANG JINZHEN) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN107637862 (CHINA TOBACCO GUIZHOU IND CO) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN109077358 (SHENZHEN MERIDIAN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN209120496U (SHENZHEN ZIWUXIAN INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US2008257367 (PATERNO GREG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN103815547 (YUNNAN TOBACCO SCI RES INST) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN104522892 (SHENZHEN BICOM OPTICS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN106418701 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO COMPANY) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108095203 (KUNMING NATAI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9999250 (MINSKOFF NOAH MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]CN108378426 (HANGZHOU SENYI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 27-38, figure 1 *; | [A]CN109674093 (CHINA TOBACCO ANHUI IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |