EP4091296 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NETWORK MONITORING, REPORTING, AND RISK MITIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Field Effect Software Inc. 207 - 825 Exhibition Way Ottawa ON K1S 5J3 / CA | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOSCHMANN, Andrew c/o Field Effect Software Inc. 207-825 Exhibition Way Ottawa, Ontario K1S 5J3 / CA | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Bartholomew, Anna, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741523.1 | 18.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021CA50046 | Priority number, date | US202062962519P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962519 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142550 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091296 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/22, H04L9/00, H04L9/40, G06F21/57, H04L41/0604, H04L41/0681, H04L41/0816 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04L41/0604 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (KR,US);
H04L63/205 (US);
G06F21/577 (EP,KR);
H04L41/0681 (EP,KR);
H04L41/0816 (EP);
H04L63/02 (KR);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04L63/1425 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | H04L12/22, H04L12/24, H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR NETZWERKÜBERWACHUNG, MELDUNG UND RISIKOABSCHWÄCHUNG | [2022/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NETWORK MONITORING, REPORTING, AND RISK MITIGATION | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE DE RÉSEAU, DE RAPPORT ET DE RÉDUCTION DE RISQUES | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017171231 (REYBOK JR RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2017171235 (MULCHANDANI SHAAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017230412 (THOMAS BERNARD [US], et al) | International search | [A]EP1405187 (COMPUTER ASS THINK INC [US]); | [X]US2008148398 (MEZACK DEREK JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2017223039 (MONT MARCO CASASSA [GB], et al) | by applicant | US2017171231 | US2017171235 | US2017230412 |