EP4090253 - TISSUE TREATMENT DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fractyl Health, Inc. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIASELLA, Michael c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 02 /
MORNEAU, Sara c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 03 /
CAPLAN, Jay c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 04 /
RICHES, Michelle c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 05 /
LEVIN, Philip c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 06 /
CAHILL, Ryan c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 07 /
BOUDREAU, Keith c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 08 /
RAJAGOPALAN, Harith c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 09 /
ZARECHIAN, Brendan c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 10 /
FLAHERTY, Maxwell R. c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 11 /
FLAHERTY, Christopher J. c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 12 /
LESICA, Jeffrey c/o FRACTYL LABORATORIES, INC 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741538.9 | 12.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021US13072 | Priority number, date | US202062960340P | 13.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062960340 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146190 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090253 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/29, A61B17/94, A61B1/005, A61B1/012, A61B1/018, A61B18/14, A61B18/02, A61B18/04, // A61M25/10 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP);
A61B18/04 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61M25/10 (EP);
A61B2017/00269 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2017/22082 (EP);
A61B2017/308 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (US);
A61B2018/00255 (EP);
A61B2018/00494 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP);
A61B2018/0262 (EP);
A61B2018/044 (EP);
A61B2018/046 (US);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/3925 (EP);
A61B2090/3937 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61B2218/002 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | A61B17/00, A61B17/29, A61B17/94, A61B1/005, A61B1/012, A61B1/018 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | GEWEBEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN, -SYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2022/47] | English: | TISSUE TREATMENT DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES, ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSU | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005148997 (VALLEY KIRSTEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0127] *; | [X]US2011245822 (BAXTER LINCOLN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-14 * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103]; figures 1,14 * * paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2016136393 (TSAI LEO LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2017296252 (CLARK BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]US2017348049 (VRBA ANTHONY CIRO [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * paragraph [0218] - paragraph [0222]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0216] * * paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0409] * * paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0189] * [I] 8,15; | [A]WO2018022404 (COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2019018362 (FRACTYL LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US2016136393 (TSAI LEO LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * entire document * [Y] 5; | [A]US2017325666 (JIANG SHOUWANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-5, 27* , entire document *; | [A]US2018221622 (RAJAGOPALAN HARITH [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 27 * , entire document *; | [XY]WO2019018362 (FRACTYL LAB INC [US]) [X] 27 * , entire document * [Y] 5 |