EP4091343 - MULTI-SIGNAL DETECTION AND COMBINATION OF AUDIO-BASED DATA TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LISNR 1340 Clay Street, Suite 400 Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDEL, Oz c/o LISNR 1340 Clay St, Suite 400 Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
KNAUER, William c/o LISNR 1340 Clay St, Suite 400 Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741560.3 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021US13637 | Priority number, date | US202016746134 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US202016746134 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146558 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091343 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04R29/00, H04R5/00, H04B11/00, H04R1/40, H04R3/00 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
H04R1/406 (EP);
G10L19/008 (US);
H04B11/00 (EP);
H04R3/005 (EP);
H04R2201/401 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | H04R29/00, H04R5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | MEHRSIGNALDETEKTION UND KOMBINATION VON AUDIOBASIERTEN DATENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2022/47] | English: | MULTI-SIGNAL DETECTION AND COMBINATION OF AUDIO-BASED DATA TRANSMISSIONS | [2022/47] | French: | DÉTECTION MULTI-SIGNAL ET COMBINAISON DE TRANSMISSIONS DE DONNÉES À BASE D'AUDIO | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014192622 (ROWE ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US9769563 (KIRSCH JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * figures 1, 3 * * column 5, lines 58-62 * * column 6, lines 20-25 * * column 7, lines 22-24 * * column 11, lines 64-67 * * column 12, lines 1-11 * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [A]US2019090052 (RADMANESH NASIM [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]US10433084 (ANDERSON MATT [US]) [X] 1,13 * figure 1 * * column 7, lines 3-8, 19-21, 32-34, 36-40 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2-5,10-12,14,15 | International search | [A]US6931134 (WALLER JR JAMES K [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2008281586 (FLORENCIO DINEI A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014364075 (SULLIVAN TERENCE SEAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9299364 (PEREIRA JOSE PIO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017070250 (KUNDMANN THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - Kiho Cho, Jae Choi, Nam Soo Kim, "An acoustic data transmission system based on audio data hiding: method and performance evaluation", EURASIP Journal on Audio, Speech, and Music Processing, (20151201), vol. 2015, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13636-015-0053-x, XP055357957 [A] 1-20 * ; :- entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13636-015-0053-x |