EP4091034 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR BATTERY POWERED EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLLER, Mark c/o Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Todd c/o Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741839.1 | 12.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021IB50197 | Priority number, date | US202062960549P | 13.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062960549 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144693 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091034 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, H02J7/00, H02J13/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H02J7/00034 (EP);
H02J7/007188 (US);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M10/482 (US);
H01M50/204 (US);
H01M50/296 (US);
H02J13/00022 (EP);
H02J13/00028 (EP);
H02J7/00032 (US);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP);
H02J7/0071 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2010/4278 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M2220/30 (US);
H04B5/77 (US);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | G06F1/32, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BATTERIEBETRIEBENE GERÄTE | [2022/47] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR BATTERY POWERED EQUIPMENT | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIES POUR ÉQUIPEMENT ALIMENTÉ PAR BATTERIE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016087314 (ARASHIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0080] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0115] *[I] 2-7,9-12,14,15 | International search | [A]US2007155443 (CHEON SUNG-ROCK [KR], et al) [A] 1-34 * , para [0038], [0040]-[0041] *; | [A]US2009186264 (HUANG DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *; | [A]US2013164567 (OLSSON MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , para [0084]-[0085], [0092], [0099], [0103]-[0104] *; | [A]US2015318582 (BROCKMAN DARYL C [US], et al) [A] 1-34* , entire document *; | [A]US2016087314 (ARASHIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document * |