EP4084482 - STREAM PULL METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LIVE STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No.6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Yuan c/o Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Zhe c/o Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
CAO, Nan c/o Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Junjian c/o Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 05 /
YU, Bing c/o Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 21741960.5 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/44] | WO2021CN72280 | Priority number, date | CN20201051613 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010051613 | [2022/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021143881 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084482 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2187, H04L67/1095, H04N21/2225, H04N21/2743, H04N21/2747, H04N21/8352, H04N21/858, H04N21/239, H04N21/658 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04N21/2225 (EP);
H04N21/2187 (CN,US);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L67/1097 (EP);
H04L67/53 (EP);
H04L67/563 (EP);
H04N21/236 (US);
H04N21/2393 (EP,CN);
H04N21/26208 (CN);
H04N21/2743 (EP);
H04N21/2747 (EP);
H04N21/437 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | H04N21/2187 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | STREAM-PULL-VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN LIVE-STREAM | [2022/44] | English: | STREAM PULL METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LIVE STREAM | [2022/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TIRAGE DE FLUX POUR FLUX EN DIRECT | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2022 | Translation filed | 26.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 13.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/45] | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015263916 (PHILLIPS CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]CN109639635 (BEIJING DAJIA INTERCONNECTION INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109756758 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019134470 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3591941 (WANGSU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP3595268 (WANGSU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0021] , [ 0022] , [0069] * | International search | [A]US2014282777 (GONDER TOM [US], et al) [A] 1-23* entire document *; | [Y]CN108712343 (WANGSU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs 0023-0033 *; | [A]CN108737405 (WANGSU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [Y]CN109756758 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs 0039-0155 *; | [A]CN110012300 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * entire document * |