EP4179593 - CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT AND ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto-von-Guericke-Universität Magdeburg Universitätsplatz 2 39106 Magdeburg / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRETSCHMANN, Robert 39130 MAGDEBURG / DE | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Marian 39108 Magdeburg / DE | 03 /
SCHISCHIN, Iwan 39114 MAGDEBURG / DE | 04 /
WAGENHAUS, Gerd 04509 SCHÖNWÖLKAU / DE | 05 /
LÜDECKE, Stefan 39108 MAGDEBURG / DE | 06 /
SIEDENSTICKER, Kai 39104 MAGDEBURG / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Schlosser, Martin Patentanwalt Hofleitenstraße 34 86356 Neusäß / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21743394.5 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021EP68592 | Priority number, date | DE202010117902 | 07.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020117902 | [2023/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008482 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179593 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/105, H01M50/502, H01M50/553 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H01M50/105 (EP);
H01M50/502 (EP);
H01M50/553 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIESPEICHER | [2023/20] | English: | CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT AND ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORE | [2023/20] | French: | MONTAGE DE CONNEXION ET ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 10.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014113506 (JONES JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-9,21-25,28 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0 28] - [0040] * * claims 1-13 * * figures 9, 10 * [I] 10-20,26,27; | [X]US9768474 (LEE YUN NYOUNG [KR]) [X] 1-9,13,21-25,28* claims 1-16 * |