EP4095235 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE OF IMMORTALIZED SKIN CELLS HAVING SUPERFICIAL LAYER FORMED FROM STRATUM CORNEUM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE, AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING TEST SUBSTANCE USING SAID THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA Tatsunosuke c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA Yoshihiro c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, 2217-14, Hayashi-cho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0395 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI Koyomi c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 04 /
OHMIYA Yoshihiro c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, 1-8-31, Midorigaoka Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21743842.3 | 21.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021JP02020 | Priority number, date | JP20200008607 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020008607 | [2022/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149761 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095235 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C12N5/0629 (EP,US);
C12N5/0626 (US);
C12N5/0698 (EP,US);
C12N5/166 (EP);
G01N33/5044 (EP);
C12N2503/04 (EP);
C12N2510/04 (EP,US);
C12N2513/00 (EP,US);
C12N2525/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE KULTUR VON IMMORTALISIERTEN HAUTZELLEN MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHENSCHICHT AUS STRATUM CORNEUM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER DREIDIMENSIONALEN KULTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINER TESTSUBSTANZ UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESER DREIDIMENSIONALEN KULTUR | [2022/48] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE OF IMMORTALIZED SKIN CELLS HAVING SUPERFICIAL LAYER FORMED FROM STRATUM CORNEUM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE, AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING TEST SUBSTANCE USING SAID THREE-DIMENSIONAL CULTURE | [2022/48] | French: | CULTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DE CELLULES CUTANÉES IMMORTALISÉES AYANT UNE COUCHE SUPERFICIELLE FORMÉE DE STRATUM CORNEUM, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE CULTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE D'ESSAI À L'AIDE DE LADITE CULTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | Translation filed | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02070729 (STRATATECH CORP [US], et al); | [Y]JP2018102186 (NIPPON MENAADE KESHOHIN KK); | International search | [A]JPH0889239 (GUNZE KK); | [XY]WO2018020970 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | by applicant | JP2010193822 | WO2012002507 | JP2019514370 | JP2020008607 |