EP4093655 - SUSPENDED UNDERCARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A TRACK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soucy International Inc. 5450 Rue Saint-Roch Drummondville, Québec J2B 6W3 / CA | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUVAGEAU, Yves 1760 rue Desjardins Drummondville Québec J2B 3Y5 / CA | 02 /
NANAC, Branislav 5190 rue Martine Drummondville Québec J2E 1T6 / CA | 03 /
BARRY, David 50 du Bord de l Eau Est, Apt. 317 Longueuil, Québec J4H 0A1 / CA | 04 /
ALLIE, Styve 4910 Lapèro Nord Drummondville Québec J2E 1P3 / CA | 05 /
ST-ARNAUD, Charles 2356 1ère avenue Trois-Rivières, Québec G8Z 2X3 / CA | 06 /
PELLERIN, Michel 910 rue Blouin Drummondville Québec J2C 7E7 / CA | 07 /
PARE, Steeve 735 Route Guilbault St-Majorique Québec J2B 8A8 / CA | 08 /
PATRY, Marc-Andre 2265 Schubert Drummondville Québec J2B 0J9 / CA | 09 /
CHANTAL, Gabriel 1346 Rang de la Rivière Nord Saint-Pie Québec J0H 1W0 / CA | 10 /
RIVARD, Maxime 102 rue Montcalm Blainville Québec J7C 2R6 / CA | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21744213.6 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021IB50507 | Priority number, date | US202062964954P | 23.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062964954 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149008 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093655 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/10, B60B11/00, B62D49/06, B62D55/04, B62D55/08, B62D55/12 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B62D55/15 (EP);
B62D55/1086 (US);
B60B11/00 (EP);
B60B19/12 (EP);
B62D55/084 (US);
B62D55/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | AUFGEHÄNGTES FAHRWERK FÜR EIN SCHIENENSYSTEM | [2022/48] | English: | SUSPENDED UNDERCARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A TRACK SYSTEM | [2022/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE CHÂSSIS SUSPENDU POUR SYSTÈME DE CHENILLE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5899543 (LYKKEN THOMAS G [US], et al); | [A]US9452796 (FRANCK RANDALL [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5899543 (LYKKEN THOMAS G [US], et al); | [A]US2015217816 (FRANCK RANDALL [IN], et al); | [A]WO2019012453 (SOUCY INT INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2019078119 (NSK LTD [JP]); | [A]US2019118879 (GUSTAFSON ALAN D [US]) | by applicant | WO2017050721 | WO2017054986 |