EP4095622 - IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Koichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744245.8 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021JP02704 | Priority number, date | JP20200008791 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020008791 | [2022/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149835 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095622 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00, G03G15/01, G03G15/16, G03G21/14 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G03G15/1615 (EP,US);
G03G21/14 (EP);
G03G2215/00738 (EP);
G03G2221/1654 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | G03G21/00, G03G15/01, G03G15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | Translation filed | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014072340 (KATO YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2014199089 (ISHIKAWA TAKATOSHI [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2007212541 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]US2008080907 (PARGETT STACY MARIE [US], et al); | [A]JP2013178447 (RICOH CO LTD); | [A]JP2017044838 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [A]JP2019120830 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2019200283 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JP2014134718 | JP2020008791 |