EP4094094 - RADAR SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radomatics Ltd. P.O. Box 284 4880500 Kibutz Einat / IL | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOREA, Ehud P.O. Box 284 4880500 Kibutz Einat / IL | 02 /
GINZBURG, Eugenie 31 Engel St. 4465147 Kfar Saba / IL | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744417.3 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021IL50060 | Priority number, date | US202062964352P | 22.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062964352 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021149049 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4094094 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/87, G01S7/02, G01S7/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G01S13/878 (EP,IL);
G01S13/89 (US);
G01S13/87 (US);
G01S7/003 (EP,IL);
G01S7/0232 (EP,IL);
G01S7/0234 (EP,IL);
G01S7/0235 (EP,IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | G01S13/02, G01S13/66, G01S13/72, G01S13/87, G01S13/88, G01S7/03, G01S7/282, G01S7/285 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | RADARSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2022/48] | English: | RADAR SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/48] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RADAR | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005038488 (RAYTHEON CO [US], et al); | [A]US2014062753 (GROOTERS REINDERT [NL], et al); | [I]JP5984376B ; | [A]US2018313952 (GIERE DR ANDRE [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]US2005250452 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al); | [YA]US2007191062 (KIM YONG-SEOK [KR], et al); | [XYA]US2010265122 (OSWALD GORDON KENNETH ANDREW [GB]); | [A]US2012139777 (HUNTER KYLE P [US]) | by applicant | WO2005038488 | US2014062753 | JP5984376B | US2018313952 |