EP4094064 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CELL-LIKE CALIBRATION PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Slingshot Biosciences, Inc. 1250 45th Street Suite 150 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jeffrey 2430 5th Street Suite D Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Anh Tuan 643 Shadow Creek Drive San Jose, California 95136 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Brandon 6406 Oakwood Drive Oakland, California 94611 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744765.5 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14538 | Priority number, date | US202062965494P | 24.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965494 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021150838 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094064 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N15/10, C08L33/26, G01N21/00, G01N21/27, G01N33/96 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G01N15/1012 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/26 (EP,KR);
G01N15/147 (EP,KR);
G01N21/64 (EP,KR);
G01N33/4833 (KR);
G01N33/5047 (EP);
G01N33/533 (KR);
G01N33/54313 (EP);
G01N2015/1006 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2015/1014 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/274 (EP);
G01N21/278 (EP);
G01N33/96 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR ZELLÄHNLICHE KALIBRIERUNGSPARTIKEL | [2022/48] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CELL-LIKE CALIBRATION PARTICLES | [2022/48] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À DES PARTICULES D'ÉTALONNAGE DE TYPE CELLULE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015362499 (CHAN EUGENE Y [US]); | [A]WO2018108341 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]); | [X]US2018275040 (KIM JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]WO2019048714 (EVORION BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) | International search | [A]US2005208573 (BELL MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [A]US2010285594 (PURVIS JR NORMAN BAYLIS [US]); | [A]US8748183 (DURACK GARY [US], et al); | [Y]US2015267196 (ALSBERG EBEN [US], et al); | [XA]US2018275040 (KIM JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US10481068 (KIM JEFFREY [US], et al) |