EP4096282 - INFORMATION REPORTING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK-SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yu No. 168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Peng No. 168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744881.0 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021CN72905 | Priority number, date | CN20201076949 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010076949 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021147913 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096282 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04B7/06 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0695 (US);
H04B17/318 (KR);
H04B17/336 (KR);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/046 (CN,KR);
H04W72/12 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (CN,KR);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W72/23 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSMELDUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | INFORMATION REPORTING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK-SIDE DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS, ÉQUIPEMENT TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2022 | Translation filed | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019306850 (ZHANG YUSHU [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12-15 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0215] * * paragraphs [0201] - [0205] - [0208] - [0215] * * paragraphs [0221] - [0223] - [0226] * * paragraph [0266] * * tables 2,3,5, 6 * * figure 14 * [I] 4,9,11; | [X]WO2019214600 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,5,6,14 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * paragraph [0041] * * figure 1 *; | [X]CN110536397 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-4,7,8,13-15 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] * * paragraphs [0141] - [0142] - [0145] - [0147] * * figure 4 *; | EP3793244 [ ] (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]); | EP4017144 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A] - APPLE INC, "Views on R17 MIMO enhancement", vol. TSG RAN, no. Sitges, Spain; 20191209 - 20191212, (20191202), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-192696, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/TSG_RAN/TSGR_86/Docs/RP-192696.zip RP-192696 Views on R17 MIMO enhancement.docx, (20191202), XP051834304 [A] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * | International search | [X]CN108023623 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-114 * description paragraphs [0079]-[0279] *; | [A]US2018262250 (KIM KIJUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-114* entire document *; | [A]CN110351813 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-114 * entire document *; | [PX]CN111278166 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-114 * description paragraphs [0035]-[0557] *; | [PX] - CMCC, "Enhancements on multi-beam operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-2006200, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200807), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200817 - 20200828, XP051915241 [PX] 1-114 * full text, sections 5 and 6 * | [X] - Sony, "Enhancements on multi-beam operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1906851_Enhancements on multi-beam operation, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, XP051708887 [X] 1-114 * full text, sections 2 and 3 * |