EP4193432 - BATCH OF SPARK PLUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | 06.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASKE, Stephan 75447 Sternenfels Diefenbach / DE | 02 /
ROTTMANN, Philipp 96103 Hallstadt / DE | 03 /
STOCKMEIER, Ulrich 75323 Bad Wildbad / DE | 04 /
YILMAZ, Ugur 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 05 /
BLANKMEISTER, Matthias 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 06 /
BUDDE, Matthias 71679 Asperg / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21745715.9 | 13.07.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP69510 | Priority number, date | DE202010209834 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020209834 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028825 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193432 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/08, H01T21/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01T13/08 (EP,US);
H01T13/32 (US);
H01T21/02 (EP);
H01T13/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | CHARGE VON ZÜNDKERZEN | [2023/24] | English: | BATCH OF SPARK PLUGS | [2023/24] | French: | LOT DE BOUGIES D'ALLUMAGE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1039601 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 6,7* paragraph [0008] *; | [X]EP1850432 (BERU AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure 2 *; | [XY]WO2013164130 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 8 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,7; | [XDYI]DE102017107728 (FED MOGUL IGNITION GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-5 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] * * claims 1, 2 * * figures 4-6 * [Y] 7 [I] 6 | by applicant | DE102017107728 |