EP4022338 - GEOLOCATING A RADIO TRANSMITTER THROUGH PRECISE MODELLING OF IONOSPHERIC PROPAGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space SAS 31 rue des Cosmonautes ZI du Palays 31402 Toulouse Cedex 4 / FR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEANNIN, Nicolas 31402 Toulouse cedex 4 / FR | 02 /
VOULOUZAN, Frédéric 31402 Toulouse cedex 4 / FR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21746478.3 | 20.07.2021 | [2022/27] | WO2021EP70227 | Priority number, date | FR20200007717 | 28.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007717 | [2022/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023116 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022338 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4022338 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G01S5/0273 (EP);
G01S5/02528 (EP);
G01S5/02213 (EP);
G01S5/0246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEOLOKALISIERUNG EINES FUNKSENDERS DURCH GENAUE MODELLIERUNG DER IONOSPHÄRISCHEN AUSBREITUNG | [2022/27] | English: | GEOLOCATING A RADIO TRANSMITTER THROUGH PRECISE MODELLING OF IONOSPHERIC PROPAGATION | [2022/27] | French: | GÉOLOCALISATION D'UN ÉMETTEUR RADIO À L'AIDE D'UNE MODÉLISATION PRÉCISE DE LA PROPAGATION IONOSPHÉRIQUE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2017205492 (JACKLIN NEIL A [US], et al); | [IY]US2019120928 (O`SHEA TIMOTHY JAMES [US], et al); |