EP4179610 - GEARED MOTOR HAVING A CYLINDRICAL CASING AND CORRESPONDING TUBULAR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovaction Technologies ZA du Bois Vert 2 42110 Epercieux St Paul / FR | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAJNOVIC, Srecko 42110 EPERCIEUX ST PAUL / FR | 02 /
DENIS, Sylvain 42300 VILLEREST / FR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21746524.4 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021FR51248 | Priority number, date | FR20200007238 | 08.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007238 | FR20200009887 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: FR 2009887 | [2023/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008840 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179610 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/116, F16H57/08, B65G23/08, F16B5/10, F16B21/02, F16H1/28 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
F16H57/08 (EP);
F16H57/082 (US);
B65G23/08 (EP);
F16H1/28 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K2207/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEMOTOR MIT EINEM ZYLINDERGEHÄUSE UND ENTSPRECHENDER ROHRMOTOR | [2023/20] | English: | GEARED MOTOR HAVING A CYLINDRICAL CASING AND CORRESPONDING TUBULAR MOTOR | [2023/20] | French: | MOTORÉDUCTEUR À ENVELOPPE CYLINDRIQUE ET MOTEUR TUBULAIRE CORRESPONDANT | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 31.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002276742 (KYO SHUNHO) [A] 1-12 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] ** paragraphs [0005] - [0006] *; | [Y]US2008197733 (OBERLE HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3-10 * figures 2,4,6 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] *; | [Y]FR3016013 (CHASSIS BRAKES INT BV [NL]) [Y] 1,3-8 * figures 6-7 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 29 *; | [YA]US2019305629 (MANS ERWIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3-10 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0062] * [A] 2,11,12 |