EP4179444 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ANONYMISATION OF TIME SERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIG DATA SANTE 49 rue Condorcet 44100 Nantes / FR | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELVAUX, Louis 71270 Pierre de Bresse / FR | 02 /
BREILLACQ, Olivier 44100 Nantes / FR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Yes My Patent 32 Boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Touroude & Associates 2 bis Rue Alfred Nobel 77420 Champs sur Marne / FR | Application number, filing date | 21746775.2 | 08.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021FR51260 | Priority number, date | FR20200007245 | 08.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007245 | [2023/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008845 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179444 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, H04W12/02, G06F17/18 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G06F21/6254 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ANONYMISIERUNG VON ZEITREIHEN | [2023/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ANONYMISATION OF TIME SERIES | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ANONYMISATION DE SÉRIES TEMPORELLES | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2010064373 (CAI YING [US], et al); | by applicant | US2015007341 | CA2980618 |